Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Silvio Cardinal Passerini

Deceased

Bishop of Cortona, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina

Administrator of Assisi

Administrator of Barcelona

Administrator of Sarno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1469²Born
1 Jul 151748.5Elevated to Cardinal
6 Jul 151748.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
18 Feb 151849.1AppointedAdministrator of Sarno, Italy
20 Jun 151950.4ResignedAdministrator of Sarno, Italy
17 Sep 152051.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
5 Jan 152152.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
15 Nov 152152.8AppointedBishop of Cortona, Italy
1524²55.0AppointedAdministrator of Sarno, Italy
28 Jun 152556.4AppointedAdministrator of Barcelona, Spain
19 Jan 152657.0AppointedAdministrator of Assisi, Italy
20 Apr 152960.3DiedBishop of Cortona, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Silvio Passerini (VIAF: 15853440)
Silvio Cardinal Passerini (born 1469, died ) Bishop of Cortona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCortona, Diocese of Cortona
Death PlaceCittÓ di Castello

  • a cardinal for 11.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Jul 1517
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 120, and Page 293
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 179
  • b: Episcopologio Espa˝ol, Volume 1,500, Page 249, Number 4
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1521, Number 38*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Jun 2021

Quantcast