Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ambrogio da Parma

Deceased

Bishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Dec 1364AppointedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
20 Feb 1377AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Novigrad (Cittanova), Croatia
10 Oct 1380AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
1389²AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
1391¹DiedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ambrogio da Parma
Archbishop Ambrogio da Parma (died 1391) Bishop of Viterbo e Tuscania

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 532, and Page 201
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 74, and Page 101

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 May 2021

Quantcast