Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Alejandro Daniel Pardo

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Buenos Aires, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Fissiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1978 Born
18 Nov 200628.6Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
19 Jun 202446.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
19 Jun 202446.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Fissiana
3 Aug 202446.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fissiana

MicroData Summary for Alejandro Daniel Pardo
(WikiData: Q126734251)
Father Alejandro Daniel Pardo (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Buenos Aires

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires
Ordained BishopCathedral, Buenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Buenos Aires.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Jun 2024
  • bp/c1: CB, 19 Jun 2024
  • ob/c2: CB, 24 Jun 2024

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.6, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 24 Jun 2024