Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillermo Rodrigo Teodoro Ortiz Mondragón

Deceased

Bishop of Cuautitlán, México, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1947Born
5 Jun 197629.2Ordained PriestPriest of México, Federal District
29 Jan 200052.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District
29 Jan 200052.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Nova Barbara
4 Mar 200052.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nova Barbara
19 Oct 200558.5AppointedBishop of Cuautitlán, México, México
23 Nov 200558.6InstalledBishop of Cuautitlán, México, México
14 Sep 202174.5DiedBishop of Cuautitlán, México, México

MicroData Summary for Guillermo Rodrigo Teodoro Ortiz Mondragón
Bishop Guillermo Rodrigo Teodoro Ortiz Mondragón (born , died ) Bishop of Cuautitlán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToluca
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora de Guadalupe, Basilica, Guadalupe
Death PlaceCuautitlán Izcalli, Diocese of Cuautitlán, México

  • a priest for 45.2 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Oct 2005
  • i: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Number 13,710
  • d: CB, 14 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 15 Sep 2021

Quantcast