Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Poncello Cardinal Orsini

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Clemente


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Jun 1370AppointedBishop of Aversa, Italy
18 Sep 1378AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
18 Sep 1378Elevated to Cardinal
2 Feb 1395³DiedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Poncello Orsini
Poncello Cardinal Orsini (died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Clemente

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 16.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Sep 1378
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 123

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 17 Aug 2021

Quantcast