Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Manuel Orrego Pizarro

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of La Serena, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1817Born
26 Jun 184124.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Santiago de Chile
8 Aug 184124.3Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
21 Dec 186851.7AppointedBishop of La Serena, Chile
6 Jun 186952.1Ordained BishopBishop of La Serena, Chile
17 Sep 188770.4ResignedBishop of La Serena, Chile
19 Jul 189174.2DiedBishop Emeritus of La Serena, Chile

MicroData Summary for José Manuel Orrego Pizarro (VIAF: 732145858114323022110)
Bishop José Manuel Orrego Pizarro (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of La Serena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Ligua, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Ordained BishopCathedral, La Serena, Diocese of La Serena

  • a priest for 49.9 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 513
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1869, Number 16
  • ob.loc: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 54, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 86, Number 7,173

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast