Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop César Ramón Ortega Herrera

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Barcelona, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1938Born
30 Jun 196324.9Ordained PriestPriest
25 Aug 198345.1AppointedBishop of Margarita, Venezuela
28 Oct 198345.2Ordained BishopBishop of Margarita, Venezuela
21 Jun 199758.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Barcelona, Venezuela
15 Jul 199859.9AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Venezuela
20 Jan 201475.5RetiredBishop of Barcelona, Venezuela
8 Apr 202182.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Barcelona, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for César Ramón Ortega Herrera
Bishop César Ramón Ortega Herrera (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Barcelona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalom
Death PlaceValencia, Archdiocese of Valencia en Venezuela

  • a priest for 57.7 years
  • a bishop for 37.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Jan 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 85, Number 7,102
  • d: CB, 9 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 10 Apr 2021

Quantcast