Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pino Ordelaffi

Deceased

Bishop of Cervia, Italy

Administrator of Montefeltro


Events

DateEventTitle
1386AppointedBishop of Paphos, Cyprus
12 Dec 1386AppointedAdministrator of Montefeltro, Italy
18 Mar 1390AppointedAdministrator of Corf¨, Greece
1 Dec 1390³ResignedAdministrator of Corf¨, Greece
9 Mar 1394AppointedBishop of Cervia, Italy
1402²DiedBishop of Cervia, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Pino Ordelaffi
Bishop Pino Ordelaffi (died 1402) Bishop of Cervia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 389, and Page 183
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 247, and Page 209

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Aug 2021

Quantcast