Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Stefano Cardinal Nardini

Deceased

Archbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Nov 1461AppointedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
7 May 1473Elevated to Cardinal
7 May 1473AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Adriano al Foro
1476²AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
22 Oct 1484DiedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stefano Nardini
Stefano Cardinal Nardini (died ) Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceForlž, Diocese of Forli

  • a cardinal for 11.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 7 May 1473
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 188
  • b: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1461, Number 33*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast