Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea de’ Mozzi

Deceased

Bishop of Vicenza, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Dec 1286AppointedBishop of Firenze, Italy
13 Sep 1295AppointedBishop of Vicenza, Italy
28 Apr 1296DiedBishop of Vicenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea de’ Mozzi
Bishop Andrea de’ Mozzi (died ) Bishop of Vicenza

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 526, and Page 250

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 7 May 2021

Quantcast