Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gil Antônio Moreira

Archbishop of Juiz de Fora, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1950 Born
9 Jul 197322.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Divinópolis, Minas Gerais, Brazil
18 Dec 197626.1Ordained PriestPriest of Divinópolis, Minas Gerais, Brazil
14 Jul 199948.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil
14 Jul 199948.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Turris in Mauretania
16 Oct 199949.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Turris in Mauretania
7 Jan 200453.2AppointedBishop of Jundiaí, Sao Paulo, Brazil
15 Feb 200453.3InstalledBishop of Jundiaí, Sao Paulo, Brazil
28 Jan 200958.3AppointedArchbishop of Juiz de Fora, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Gil Antônio Moreira (VIAF: 100717247)
Archbishop Gil Antônio Moreira (born ) Archbishop of Juiz de Fora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceItapecerica
Ordained DeaconDivinópolis, Diocese of Divinópolis, Minas Gerais
Ordained PriestItapecerica, Diocese of Divinópolis, Minas Gerais
Ordained BishopSão Bento, Church, Itapecerica, Diocese of Divinópolis, Minas Gerais

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Juiz de Fora.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Jan 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,639
  • od/c1: AM, 26 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 26 Jun 2021

Quantcast