Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Ministri

Deceased

Bishop of Chur, Switzerland


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Apr 1376AppointedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
May 1376²Ordained BishopBishop of Chur, Switzerland
13 Jun 1388DiedBishop of Chur, Switzerland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johannes Ministri
Bishop Johannes Ministri (died ) Bishop of Chur

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon

  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 16 Jan 2020
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 219

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast