Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Andrew McKenzie

Bishop-Elect of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1964 Born
31 Oct 198824.0Ordained PriestPriest of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
27 May 202459.6AppointedBishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain
10 Aug 202459.8Ordained BishopBishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Andrew McKenzie
(WikiData: Q126169810)
Father Andrew McKenzie (born ) Bishop-Elect of Dunkeld

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGlasgow, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland
Ordained PriestOur Lady of Lourdes, Church, Cardonald, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland
Ordained BishopSt. Andrew, Cathedral, Dundee, Diocese of Dunkeld, Scotland

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Dunkeld.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 May 2024
  • ob: CB, 3 Jun 2024
  • c1/loc: CL, 3 Jun 2024
  • c2+: CB, 10 Jul 2024

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.7, 30 Jun 2024; Data: 11 Jul 2024