Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Georges Masri

Archbishop-Elect of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Melkite Greek), Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1968 Born
24 Apr 199930.9Ordained PriestPriest of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Melkite Greek), Syria
26 Jun 202153.0SelectedArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Melkite Greek), Syria
17 Sep 202153.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Melkite Greek), Syria

MicroData Summary for Georges Masri
Father Georges Masri (born ) Archbishop-Elect of Alep [Beroea, Halab]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlep, Archdiocese of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Melkite Greek)

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Melkite Greek).

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Sep 2021
  • op/c1: CB, 17 Sep 2021
  • sele: JPG, 17 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 21 Sep 2021

Quantcast