Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuel A. Mapunda

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mbinga, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1935Born
8 Aug 196529.6Ordained PriestPriest of Songea, Tanzania
22 Dec 198651.0AppointedBishop of Mbinga, Tanzania
6 Jan 198751.0Ordained BishopBishop of Mbinga, Tanzania
12 Mar 201175.2RetiredBishop of Mbinga, Tanzania
16 May 201983.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Mbinga, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel A. Mapunda
Bishop Emmanuel A. Mapunda (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mbinga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParangu
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceOn a plane

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 32.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Mar 2011
  • d: CB, 16 May 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 101, Number 8,772

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Apr 2021

Quantcast