Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roberto Madrigal Gallegos

Bishop of Tuxpan, Veracruz, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1967 Born
5 Feb 199729.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Tabasco, México
30 Nov 199729.9Ordained PriestPriest of Tabasco, México
27 Feb 202153.2AppointedBishop of Tuxpan, Veracruz, México
19 May 202153.4Ordained BishopBishop of Tuxpan, Veracruz, México

MicroData Summary for Roberto Madrigal Gallegos
Bishop Roberto Madrigal Gallegos (born ) Bishop of Tuxpan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEjido Iquinuapa, Diocese of Tabasco
Ordained DeaconCathedral, Villahermosa, Diocese of Tabasco
Ordained PriestParque la Choca, Villahermosa, Diocese of Tabasco
Ordained BishopOutdoors, Seminario Menor Nuestra Señora de Guadalupe, Tuxpan, Diocese of Tuxpan, Veracruz

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tuxpan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Feb 2021
  • od/c01: CB, 2 Mar 2021
  • ob: CB, 19 Mar 2021
  • c2+: CB, 9 May 2021
  • c2+: CB, 19 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 20 May 2021

Quantcast