Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
29 Aug 1899 | Born | ||
29 Jun 1925 | 25.8 | Ordained Priest | Priest |
10 Mar 1956 | 56.5 | Appointed | Bishop of Veroli-Frosinone, Italy |
29 Apr 1956 | 56.6 | Ordained Bishop | Bishop of Veroli-Frosinone, Italy |
14 Apr 1962 | 62.6 | Resigned | Bishop of Veroli-Frosinone, Italy |
14 Apr 1962 | 62.6 | Appointed | Titular Bishop of Thagora |
3 May 1975 | 75.6 | Died | Bishop Emeritus of Veroli-Frosinone, Italy |
(WikiData: Q16658026)
Bishop
Carlo
Livraghi
(born , died )
Bishop Emeritus
of Veroli-Frosinone
|
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Villanova Sillano |
Ordained Bishop | Church, San Colombano al Lambrio, Diocese of Lodi |
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024 |
✠