Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Leyva

Deceased

Bishop of Almería, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1630¹Born
8 Aug 170171.6AppointedBishop of Almería, Spain
16 Oct 170171.7Ordained BishopBishop of Almería, Spain
15 Mar 170474.2DiedBishop of Almería, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Leyva
Bishop Juan Leyva (born 1630, died ) Bishop of Almería

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastro del Río
Ordained BishopGranada, Archdiocese of Granada

  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 21, Number 14
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1701, Number 37
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 79
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 76, Number 6,092

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast