Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paolo dei Lapi (Francisci de Roma), O.F.M. †

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Thessalonica


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Dec 1367AppointedBishop of Isernia, Italy
3 Feb 1379AppointedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
18 Apr 1418AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica

MicroData Summary for Paolo dei Lapi (Francisci de Roma)
Archbishop Paolo dei Lapi (Francisci de Roma) O.F.M. , Titular Archbishop of Thessalonica

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 349, and Page 484
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 287

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Jul 2021

Quantcast