Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Antoine Khawam, B.A.

Apostolic Exarch of Venezuela (Melkite Greek)

Titular Bishop of Apamea in Syria dei Greco-Melkiti

Apostolic Administrator of Nuestra Señora del Paraíso en México (Melkite Greek)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1968 Born
1987²18.7EnteredMember of Ordre Basilien Alépin (Melkite Greek)
5 Aug 199527.3Solemn VowsMember of Ordre Basilien Alépin (Melkite Greek)
16 Dec 199527.6Ordained PriestPriest of Ordre Basilien Alépin (Melkite Greek)
20 Dec 201951.6AppointedApostolic Exarch of Venezuela (Melkite Greek)
20 Dec 201951.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Apamea in Syria dei Greco-Melkiti
20 Dec 201951.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Nuestra Señora del Paraíso en México (Melkite Greek)
7 Mar 202051.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Apamea in Syria dei Greco-Melkiti
21 Mar 202152.9InstalledApostolic Exarch of Venezuela (Melkite Greek)
21 Mar 202152.9InstalledApostolic Administrator of Nuestra Señora del Paraíso en México (Melkite Greek)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Antoine Khawam
Bishop Joseph Antoine Khawam B.A. (born ) Apostolic Exarch of Venezuela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAleppo
Ordained BishopSaint-Paul, Basilica, Harissa, Archdiocese of Beirut and Jbeil {Bairut e Gibail} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

Please contact the Bishop through the Apostolic Exarchate of Venezuela (Melkite Greek).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Dec 2019
  • ob: CB, 29 Jan 2020
  • c2+/i: CB, 15 Feb 2020
  • mn: CB, 15 Dec 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 243, Number 20,362
  • i: CB, 11 Mar 2021
  • i: CB, 22 Mar 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Mar 2021

Quantcast