Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andrzej Józwowicz

Apostolic Nuncio to Iran

Titular Archbishop of Lauriacum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1965 Born
24 May 199025.3Ordained PriestPriest of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
25 Mar 199227.1IncardinatedPriest of Łowicz, Poland
18 Mar 201752.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Rwanda
18 Mar 201752.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Lauriacum
27 May 201752.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Lauriacum
28 Jun 202156.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Iran

MicroData Summary for Andrzej Józwowicz (VIAF: 165869340)
Archbishop Andrzej Józwowicz (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Iran

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBoćki, Archdiocese of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
Ordained PriestMartyrdom of St. John the Baptist, Cathedral Basilica, Warszawa, Archdiocese of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
Ordained BishopAssumption of the Blessed Virgin Mary, Cathedral Basilica, Łowicz, Diocese of Łowicz, Poland

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Iran.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Mar 2017
  • c34: CB, 26 May 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Number 19,431
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 28 Jun 2021

Quantcast