Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Marian Franciszek Cardinal Jaworski

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Lviv, Ukraine

Cardinal-Priest of San Sisto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1926Born
25 Jun 195023.8Ordained PriestPriest of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
21 May 198457.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Lviv, Ukraine
21 May 198457.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Lambaesis
23 Jun 198457.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lambaesis
16 Jan 199164.4AppointedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
18 May 199669.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Lutsk, Ukraine
21 Feb 199871.5Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
16 May 199871.7CeasedApostolic Administrator of Lutsk, Ukraine
21 Feb 200174.5Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 200174.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
21 Oct 200882.1RetiredArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
5 Sep 202094.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Lviv, Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Marian Franciszek Jaworski (VIAF: 30474488)
Marian Franciszek Cardinal Jaworski (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Lviv

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLviv
Ordained BishopWawel, Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
Death PlaceKraków, Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland

  • a priest for 70.1 years
  • a bishop for 36.2 years
  • a cardinal for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Oct 2008
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 5 Sep 2020
  • mn: CB, 6 Sep 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 90, Number 7,625
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 245, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 246, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 5 May 2021

Quantcast