Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giacomo Cardinal d’Itri

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede

Titular See: (pseudocardinal)


Events

DateEventTitle
1358¹AppointedBishop of Ischia, Italy
22 Mar 1359AppointedBishop of Martirano (Martoranum), Italy
20 Dec 1363AppointedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
18 Jan 1376AppointedAdministrator of Otranto, Italy
18 Jan 1376AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
18 Dec 1378AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
18 Dec 1378Elevated to Cardinal
Nov 1387³AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
30 Mar 1393DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacomo d’Itri
Giacomo Cardinal d’Itri (died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede

EventPlace
Birth PlaceItri
Death PlaceAvignon

  • a cardinal for 14.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 329, and Page 280
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 286, and Page 206
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1378

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 Jul 2021

Quantcast