Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Agostino Grimaldi

Deceased

Archbishop of Oristano, Italy

Bishop of Grasse

Bishop of Mallorca


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Feb 1498AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Grasse, France
1 Jul 1505SucceededBishop of Grasse, France
28 Mar 1530AppointedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
29 Mar 1530AppointedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
12 Apr 1532DiedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Agostino Grimaldi
Archbishop Agostino Grimaldi (died ) Archbishop of Oristano

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 115, and Page 205
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 233

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 27 Apr 2021

Quantcast