Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Linus Nirmal Gomes, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Baruipur, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1921Born
21 Nov 195433.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
30 May 197755.7AppointedBishop of Baruipur, India
19 Nov 197756.1Ordained BishopBishop of Baruipur, India
31 Oct 199574.1RetiredBishop of Baruipur, India
27 Feb 202199.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Baruipur, India

MicroData Summary for Linus Nirmal Gomes
Bishop Linus Nirmal Gomes S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Baruipur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBoro Golla
Ordained BishopCalcutta, Archdiocese of Calcutta
Death PlaceSt. Xavier's College, Kolkata, Archdiocese of Calcutta

  • a priest for 66.2 years
  • a bishop for 43.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 45, Number 3,076
  • d: CB, 27 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 Apr 2021

Quantcast