Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ottone Ghilini

Deceased

Archbishop of Genova, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
1178²AppointedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
1185²AppointedBishop of Bobbio, Italy
23 Sep 1203SelectedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
18 Nov 1203ConfirmedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
30 Oct 1239DiedArchbishop of Genova, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ottone Ghilini
Archbishop Ottone Ghilini (died ) Archbishop of Genova

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 281, and Page 139

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 Jul 2021

Quantcast