Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Manuel Garita Herrera

Bishop of Ciudad Quesada, Costa Rica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1965 Born
9 Apr 198823.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of San José de Costa Rica
26 Nov 198823.6Ordained PriestPriest of San José de Costa Rica
15 Mar 201448.9AppointedBishop of Ciudad Quesada, Costa Rica
17 May 201449.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Quesada, Costa Rica

MicroData Summary for José Manuel Garita Herrera
Bishop José Manuel Garita Herrera (born ) Bishop of Ciudad Quesada

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHeredia
Ordained PriestSeminario Central, San José, Archdiocese of San José de Costa Rica
Ordained BishopCathedral, Ciudad Quesada, Diocese of Ciudad Quesada

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ciudad Quesada.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Mar 2014
  • ob/c12: CB, 15 Mar 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,163

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 May 2021

Quantcast