Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Germain de Ganay

Deceased

Bishop of Orléans, France


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Jun 1509AppointedBishop of Cahors, France
3 Jul 1514AppointedBishop of Orléans, France
8 Mar 1520DiedBishop of Orléans, France

MicroData Summary for Germain de Ganay
Bishop Germain de Ganay (died ) Bishop of Orléans

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 160, and Page 124
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1509, Number 20*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Mar 2021

Quantcast