Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giorgio Gabinelli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tinos and Mykonos, Greece

Titular Bishop of Gerasa


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Jul 1826AppointedBishop of Tinos and Mykonos, Greece
5 Nov 1826Ordained BishopBishop of Tinos and Mykonos, Greece
7 Jul 1843ResignedBishop of Tinos and Mykonos, Greece
21 Nov 1843AppointedTitular Bishop of Gerasa
30 Oct 1850DiedBishop Emeritus of Tinos and Mykonos, Greece

MicroData Summary for Giorgio Gabinelli
Bishop Giorgio Gabinelli (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tinos and Mykonos

  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 202, and Page 370
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1826, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 16 May 2021

Quantcast