Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Federico di Front e San Martino

Deceased

Bishop of Ferrara, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Jul 1264AppointedBishop of Ivrea, Italy
12 Feb 1289AppointedBishop of Ferrara, Italy
16 May 1303DiedBishop of Ferrara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Federico di Front e San Martino
Bishop Federico di Front e San Martino (died ) Bishop of Ferrara

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 286, and Page 248

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 25 Jul 2021

Quantcast