Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martín Fassi

Bishop of San Martín, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1960 Born
14 Dec 198424.0Ordained PriestPriest of San Isidro, Argentina
17 Nov 201454.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Isidro, Argentina
17 Nov 201454.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Dionysiana
11 Dec 201454.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dionysiana
5 Dec 202060.0AppointedBishop of San Martín, Argentina
26 Dec 202060.1InstalledBishop of San Martín, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Martín Fassi
Bishop Martín Fassi (born ) Bishop of San Martín

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Isidro, Diocese of San Isidro
Ordained BishopIn Front of, Cathedral, San Isidro, Diocese of San Isidro

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Martín.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Nov 2014
  • ob: CB, 17 Nov 2014
  • c2+: CB, 26 Nov 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Number 18,325
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Dec 2020
  • i: CB, 28 Dec 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 29 Dec 2020

Quantcast