Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Leo IX

St. Bruno Egisheim-Dagsburg

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1002Born
May 1026³23.8AppointedBishop of Toul, France
9 Sep 102725.2Ordained BishopBishop of Toul, France
12 Feb 104946.6ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
19 Apr 105451.8DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
1082²Canonized

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for St. Bruno Egisheim-Dagsburg (VIAF: 12317090)
Pope St. Bruno Egisheim-Dagsburg (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEguisheim
Ordained BishopWorms, Diocese of Worms, Germany

  • a bishop for 26.6 years
  • a pope for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b: Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Page 635
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 57, Number 4,137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast