Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Sergio Iván Dornelles

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Buenos Aires, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Eguga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1974 Born
17 Nov 200733.5Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
19 Jun 202450.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
19 Jun 202450.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Eguga
3 Aug 202450.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eguga

MicroData Summary for Sergio Iván Dornelles
(WikiData: Q126734250)
Father Sergio Iván Dornelles (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Buenos Aires

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGeneral Alvear, Archdiocese of Corrientes
Ordained BishopCathedral, Buenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Buenos Aires.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Jun 2024
  • c1: CB, 19 Jun 2024
  • ob/c2: CB, 24 Jun 2024

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.6, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 24 Jun 2024