Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mauritii Doria

Deceased

Bishop of Tinos and Mykonos, Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1618¹Born
9 Feb 165436.1AppointedBishop of Tinos and Mykonos, Greece
1 Mar 165436.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tinos and Mykonos, Greece
1672²54.0DiedBishop of Tinos and Mykonos, Greece

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mauritii Doria
Bishop Mauritii Doria (born 1618, died 1672) Bishop of Tinos and Mykonos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTinos, Diocese of Tinos and Mykonos
Ordained BishopSan Marco, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 337
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1654, Number 41
  • ob/c2: AT, 29 Oct 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,147

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 16 May 2021

Quantcast