Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Guillaume-Hugues Cardinal d’Estaing, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Fréjus, France

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Dec 1449Elevated to Cardinal
12 Jan 1450AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
1 Mar 1451AppointedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
27 Jun 1453AppointedBishop of Fréjus, France
11 Sep 1454ResignedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
28 Oct 1455DiedBishop of Fréjus, France

MicroData Summary for Guillaume-Hugues d’Estaing (VIAF: 317087942)
Guillaume-Hugues Cardinal d’Estaing O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Fréjus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEtain, Diocese of Verdun
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Rosary Chapel, S. Sabina, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 5.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Dec 1449
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 155, and Page 233
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1451, Number 40*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 15 Mar 2021

Quantcast