Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aloísio Hilário de Pinho, F.D.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jataí, Goias, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1934Born
19 Mar 196329.1Ordained PriestPriest of Sons of Divine Providence
9 Nov 198147.8AppointedBishop of Tocantinópolis, Tocatins, Brazil
20 Dec 198147.9Ordained BishopBishop of Tocantinópolis, Tocatins, Brazil
10 Jan 198247.9InstalledBishop of Tocantinópolis, Tocatins, Brazil
22 Dec 199965.9AppointedBishop of Jataí, Goias, Brazil
26 Feb 200066.1InstalledBishop of Jataí, Goias, Brazil
16 Dec 200975.9RetiredBishop of Jataí, Goias, Brazil
4 May 202187.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Jataí, Goias, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Aloísio Hilário de Pinho
Bishop Aloísio Hilário de Pinho F.D.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jataí

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMariana, Archdiocese of Mariana, Minas Gerais
Ordained BishopAssomption, Cathedral, São Paulo, Archdiocese of São Paulo
Death PlaceRio Claro

  • a priest for 58.1 years
  • a bishop for 39.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Dec 2009
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Number 5,848
  • d/i: CB, 4 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 5 May 2021

Quantcast