Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Matteo d’Aquino, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lecce, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Aug 1482AppointedBishop of Gravina (di Puglia), Italy
18 Feb 1508AppointedBishop of Lecce, Italy
1511²DiedBishop of Lecce, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Matteo d’Aquino
Bishop Pietro Matteo d’Aquino O.P. (died 1511) Bishop of Lecce

EventPlace
Death PlaceLecce, Diocese of Lecce

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 205, and Page 224
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 161
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1482, Number 38*
  • d.loc: CB, 6 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Sep 2021

Quantcast