Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrzej Konrad Czaja

Bishop of Opole, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1963 Born
25 Oct 198723.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Opole, Poland
11 May 198824.4Ordained PriestPriest of Opole, Poland
14 Aug 200945.6AppointedBishop of Opole, Poland
29 Aug 200945.7Ordained BishopBishop of Opole, Poland

MicroData Summary for Andrzej Konrad Czaja (VIAF: 33777218)
Bishop Andrzej Konrad Czaja (born ) Bishop of Opole

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOlesno-Wysoka
Ordained BishopCathedral, Opole, Diocese of Opole

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Opole.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Aug 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,264

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Mar 2021

Quantcast