Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Joseph Cui Qingqi, O.F.M.

Bishop of Hankow [Hankou], China

Note/Previous Titular See: (Wuhan)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Feb 1964³ Born
8 Dec 199127.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
27 Sep 202056.6SelectedBishop of Hankow [Hankou], China
23 Jun 202157.3ConfirmedBishop of Hankow [Hankou], China
8 Sep 202157.6Ordained BishopBishop of Hankow [Hankou], China

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francis Joseph Cui Qingqi
Bishop Francis Joseph Cui Qingqi O.F.M. (born Feb 1964) Bishop of Hankow [Hankou]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceXiangyuan, Diocese of Changzhi [Luan]
Ordained BishopSt. Joseph, Cathedral, Hankow, Archdiocese of Hankow [Hankou]

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Hankow [Hankou].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 5 Sep 2021
  • c2+: CB, 8 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 10 Sep 2021

Quantcast