Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Manuel Cuá Ajacum

Auxiliary Bishop of Los Altos, Quetzaltenango-Totonicapán, Guatemala

Titular Bishop of Rosella


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1962 Born
13 May 199533.0Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Guatemala
27 Mar 202158.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Los Altos, Quetzaltenango-Totonicapán, Guatemala
27 Mar 202158.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Rosella
24 Jun 202159.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rosella

MicroData Summary for Juan Manuel Cuá Ajacum
Bishop Juan Manuel Cuá Ajacum (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Los Altos, Quetzaltenango-Totonicapán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTotonicapán, Archdiocese of Los Altos, Quetzaltenango-Totonicapán
Ordained BishopEspiritu Santo, Cathedral, Quetzaltenango, Archdiocese of Los Altos, Quetzaltenango-Totonicapán

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Los Altos, Quetzaltenango-Totonicapán.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Mar 2021
  • ob: CB, 17 Jun 2021
  • c2+: CB, 23 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 24 Jun 2021

Quantcast