Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gherardo Cortenovis, B. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Ava e Pegù, Myanmar

Titular Bishop of Sozopolis in Pisidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1729Born
29 Sep 174818.9Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
28 Jan 177848.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Ava e Pegù, Myanmar
28 Jan 177848.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Sozopolis in Pisidia
2 Feb 178050.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sozopolis in Pisidia
5 May 178050.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Ava e Pegù, Myanmar

MicroData Summary for Gherardo Cortenovis
Bishop Gherardo Cortenovis B. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Ava e Pegù

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBergamo, Diocese of Bergamo, Italy
Ordained BishopMeliapore, Diocese of São Tomé of Meliapore, India
Death PlaceNancanri

  • a priest for 31.6 years
  • a bishop for .2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 385, and Page 455
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1780, Number 8
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 46, Number 3,101
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 52, Number 3,669

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast