Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bertrando Colleti, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Larino, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Jan 1349AppointedBishop of Tiflis, Georgia
8 Jun 1355AppointedBishop of Ampurias, Italy
5 Sep 1365AppointedBishop of Larino, Italy
1370¹DiedBishop of Larino, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bertrando Colleti
Bishop Bertrando Colleti O.P. (died 1370) Bishop of Larino

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 476, and Page 86
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 294

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 May 2021

Quantcast