Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Francesco Climent Sapera (Pérez Clemente)

Deceased

Archbishop of Zaragoza, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Aug 1403AppointedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
18 Mar 1405AppointedBishop of Tarazona, Spain
17 Jun 1407ResignedBishop of Tarazona, Spain
20 Jun 1407AppointedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
26 Feb 1410AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
13 Nov 1415AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
7 Jun 1419AppointedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
7 Jun 1419AppointedAdministrator of Barcelona, Spain
4 Nov 1429AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
1430²DiedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Climent Sapera (Pérez Clemente)
Patriarch Francesco Climent Sapera (Pérez Clemente) (died 1430) Archbishop of Zaragoza

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 276, and Page 153
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 128, and Page 223
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 323, and Page 486

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 Apr 2021

Quantcast