Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Morgan Casey

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Pando, Bolivia

Titular Bishop of Mibiarca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1935 Born
7 Apr 196226.7Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
3 Nov 198348.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of La Paz, Bolivia
3 Nov 198348.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Mibiarca
28 Jan 198448.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mibiarca
18 Jan 198852.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Pando, Bolivia
2 Feb 201377.6RetiredVicar Apostolic of Pando, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Luis Morgan Casey
Bishop Luis Morgan Casey (born ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Pando

EventPlace
Birth PlacePortageville, MO, USA
Ordained PriestCathedral, St. Louis, Archdiocese of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
Ordained BishopChurch, Viacha

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Pando.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 84, Number 6,992
  • c1: CB, 26 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 Jul 2021

Quantcast