Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Cardinal Castrocoeli, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Administrator of Benevento, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Vitale

Administrator of Sant’Agata de’ Goti


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Jun 1282AppointedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
1294AppointedAdministrator of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
18 Sep 1294Elevated to Cardinal
18 Sep 1294AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Vitale
13 Oct 1294AppointedAdministrator of Benevento, Italy
22 Feb 1295DiedAdministrator of Benevento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Castrocoeli
Giovanni Cardinal Castrocoeli O.S.B. (died ) Administrator of Benevento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastrocielo
Death PlaceBenevento, Archdiocese of Benevento
Buried Place (Original)Benevento, Archdiocese of Benevento

  • a cardinal for .4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Sep 1294
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 133, and Page 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Aug 2021

Quantcast