Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquín Carrillo Mayoral

Deceased

Bishop of Zamora, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1747Born
26 Mar 180456.7AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
10 Jun 180456.9Ordained BishopBishop of Zamora, Spain
12 Feb 181062.6DiedBishop of Zamora, Spain

MicroData Summary for Joaquín Carrillo Mayoral
Bishop Joaquín Carrillo Mayoral (born , died ) Bishop of Zamora

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalencia, Diocese of Palencia
Ordained BishopLérida, Diocese of Lérida

  • a bishop for 5.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1804, Number 16
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 402
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 125, Number 663
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 38, Number 2,268

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast