Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Capullio, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Conversano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1560¹Born
31 Aug 160545.6AppointedBishop of Conversano, Italy
14 Sep 160545.7Ordained BishopBishop of Conversano, Italy
24 Jun 162565.4DiedBishop of Conversano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Capullio
Bishop Pietro Capullio O.F.M. Conv. (born 1560, died ) Bishop of Conversano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCortonae
Ordained BishopXII Apotres, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 163
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1605, Number 19
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 177
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 77, Number 6,158

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast