Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father José Luis Canto Sosa

Bishop-Elect of San Andrés Tuxtla, Veracruz, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1960 Born
28 Jun 199635.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Campeche, México
27 Dec 199636.1Ordained PriestPriest of Campeche, México
14 Aug 202160.7AppointedBishop of San Andrés Tuxtla, Veracruz, México
27 Oct 202160.9Ordained BishopBishop of San Andrés Tuxtla, Veracruz, México

MicroData Summary for José Luis Canto Sosa
Father José Luis Canto Sosa (born ) Bishop-Elect of San Andrés Tuxtla

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCalkiní, Diocese of Campeche
Ordained PriestCathedral, Campeche, Diocese of Campeche

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of San Andrés Tuxtla.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Aug 2021
  • od/loc: CB, 15 Aug 2021
  • ob: CB, 27 Aug 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 27 Aug 2021

Quantcast