Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Pedro Bernardo Cannavó

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Buenos Aires, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Idassa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1978 Born
21 Nov 200931.6Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
19 Jun 202446.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
19 Jun 202446.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Idassa
3 Aug 202446.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Idassa

MicroData Summary for Pedro Bernardo Cannavó
(WikiData: Q126734253)
Father Pedro Bernardo Cannavó (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Buenos Aires

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires
Ordained BishopCathedral, Buenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Buenos Aires.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Jun 2024
  • bp/c1: CB, 19 Jun 2024
  • ob/c2: CB, 24 Jun 2024

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.6, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 24 Jun 2024