Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrew Campbell

Deceased

Bishop of Kilmore, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1711Born
5 Mar 173523.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
25 Mar 175341.3SelectedBishop of Kilmore, Ireland
3 Apr 175341.3ConfirmedBishop of Kilmore, Ireland
3 Jun 175341.5Ordained BishopBishop of Kilmore, Ireland
23 Dec 176958.0DiedBishop of Kilmore, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Andrew Campbell
Bishop Andrew Campbell (born , died ) Bishop of Kilmore

EventPlace
Ordained BishopDublin, Archdiocese of Dublin
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Port

  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 248
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1753, Number 9
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 55, Number 3,986
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 18, and Page 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast